Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787952

EP2787952 - HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avon Products, Inc.
777 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / FAIR, Michael J.
333 Stevens Avenue
Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US
02 / COLACO, Allwyn
8 Pond Hill Road
Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US
03 / HOWELL, Ashley, L.
39 Massasoit Trail
Oakland, New Jersey 07436 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12856443.203.08.2012
[2016/41]
WO2012US49522
Priority number, dateUS20111331168506.12.2011         Original published format: US201113311685
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085576
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787952
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787952
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/18, A61Q5/12
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HAARPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2014/42]
English:HAIR CARE COMPOSITIONS[2014/42]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2014National basic fee paid 
04.04.2014Search fee paid 
04.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
04.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2016Fee for grant paid
15.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.06.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2016
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.08.2012
AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/18]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/52]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT12.10.2016
BE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV12.10.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2011102261  (SEIWA KASEI CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,9-11 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0001]; example 1 * [Y] 1-13;
 [XY]JP2007077062  (NOEVIR KK) [X] 1-5,9-11 * "Subject of the invention" * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * [Y] 1-13;
 [X]US5756076  (CERVANTES FREDERIC [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 41 - column 2, line 43 *;
 [Y]  - YEON HEE LIM ET AL, "Hair conditioning effect of amino silicone softeners in varied treatment conditions", FIBERS AND POLYMERS,, (20100601), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 507 - 515, XP009177979 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12221-010-0507-9
International search[Y]US2007041929  (TORGERSON ET AL.);
 [Y]US2002058776  (FOST ET AL.);
 [Y]US2003206879  (GLENN ET AL.);
 [Y]US2003147841  (LEGRAND ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007202065  (DEVIN-BAUDOIN ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007154441  (GAWTREY ET AL.);
 [Y]US2003121109  (DEVIN-BAUDOIN ET AL.);
 [Y]US6254646  (DI LA METTRIE ET AL.)