Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789022

EP2789022 - HYBRID SOLAR ENERGY RECOVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delsaut, James
242 Maki Avenue
Sudbury, Ontario P3E 2P2 / CA
For all designated states
Leduc, Gilles
415 Paddy Lk Road
Sudbury, Ontario P3E 4N1 / CA
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12856538.906.12.2012
WO2012CA01120
Priority number, dateUS201161567759P07.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567759 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082701
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789022
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/0525, F24J2/08
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/42]H01L31/058
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDES SOLARENERGIEGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM[2014/42]
English:HYBRID SOLAR ENERGY RECOVERY SYSTEM[2014/42]
French:SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE HYBRIDE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Search fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA
17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
21.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
02.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011146662  (DEHLSEN JAMES G P [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0038] - [0045]; figure - * [I] 13;
 [XYI]DE202009003904U  (SOLARHYBRID AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0010] , [0035] , [0046] - [0063]; figure - * [Y] 4,5,12-16 [I] 8-11;
 [Y]US4040566  (CHIARELLI CARL) [Y] 12,13 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 44; figure - *;
 [Y]WO2011080367  (SOLUCIONES ENERGETICAS S A [ES], et al) [Y] 4,5,14 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2011079267  (RAYMOND MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 15,16 * paragraph [0070]; figure - *
International search[X]US2011049992  (SANT ANSELMO ROBERT [US], et al);
 [A]US2009223511  (COX EDWIN B [US]);
 [A]US2010101621  (XU JUN [US])
by applicantUS2009114212
 DE202009003904U
 US2011146662