Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792346

EP2792346 - MANICURE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Pencil Company, Limited
23-37, Higashi Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8537 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKUMA Satoshi
c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY LIMITED
Gunma Factory
1091 Tatsuishi
Fujioka-shi Gunma 375-8501 / JP
02 / AZUMA, Mitsuo
c/o MATSUMOTO YUSHI-SEIYAKU CO., LTD
1-3, Shibukawa-cho
2-chome, Yao-Shi
Osaka 5810075 / JP
03 / IKEMOTO, Yosuke
c/o MATSUMOTO YUSHI-SEIYAKU CO., LTD
1-3, Shibukawa-cho
2-chome, Yao-Shi
Osaka 5810075 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12856656.912.12.2012
WO2012JP82187
Priority number, dateJP2011027569616.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275696
JP2012024766109.11.2012         Original published format: JP 2012247661
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089135
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792346
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/37, A61Q3/02, A61K8/73, A61K8/81
[2018/08]
Former International [2015/32]A61K8/81, A61K8/33, A61K8/37, A61K8/73, A61Q3/02, A61K8/34
Former International [2014/43]A61K8/81, A61K8/33, A61K8/37, A61K8/73, A61Q3/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:MANIKÜRE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2014/43]
English:MANICURE COMPOSITION[2014/43]
French:COMPOSITION DE MANUCURE[2018/08]
Former [2014/43]COMPOSITION MANUCURE
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014Translation filed 
25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Search fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
01.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
30.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2006117449  (FIABILA [FR]; MALNOU ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1, 4, 6, 12-15 * * examples 1-3; table 1 * [Y] 1-4;
 [XY]WO9963948  (KIRKER ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 12, 13 * * examples 1-8 * [Y] 1-4
International search[Y]JP2008195627  (TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPH04103516  (KAO CORP.);
 [Y]JP2011020956  (JUJO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]US6440403  (DOMINICK D. RAZZANO);
 [A]WO2005032500  (ASANUMA CORPORATION CO., LTD., TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2000109406
 JPH0656624
 US5935590