Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792675

EP2792675 - COMPOUND AND ASYMMETRIC SYNTHESIS REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23, Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIBASAKI, Masakatsu
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
02 / KUMAGAI, Naoya
c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation
14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0021 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
[2017/15]
Former [2014/43]Graf von Stosch, Andreas , et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12856751.830.11.2012
[2017/15]
WO2012JP81042
Priority number, dateJP2011027156312.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011271563
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088972
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792675
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792675
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/33, B01J31/24, C07C323/12, C07C381/12, C07D301/02, C07D303/22, C07D309/30, C07B53/00, C07B61/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNG UND ASYMMETRISCHE SYNTHESEREAKTION[2014/43]
English:COMPOUND AND ASYMMETRIC SYNTHESIS REACTION[2014/43]
French:COMPOSÉ ET RÉACTION DE SYNTHÈSE ASYMÉTRIQUE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014Translation filed 
17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Search fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
10.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2017Fee for grant paid
03.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2016
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2012
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU30.11.2012
AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL12.04.2017
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO2004071503  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]US5693847  (TUNG ROGER D [US], et al);
 [A]JP2002275127  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP)
 [XP]  - SHO TAKECHI ET AL., "A Direct Catalytic Asymmetric Aldol Reaction of a-Sulfanyl Lactones:Efficient Synthesis of SPT Inhibitors", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20120423), vol. 51, no. 17, pages 4218 - 4222, XP055154890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201200520
 [XP]  - SHO TAKECHI ET AL., "a-thiolactone o Kyukakuzai to suru Diastereo Sentakuteki Shokubaiteki Fusei Direct Aldol Hanno", THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN DAI 132 NENKAI YOSHISHU 2, (20120305), page 154, XP008174096
 [A]  - TOMOYUKI ESUMI ET AL., "Synthesis of Viridiofungin A and its Absolute Structure", DAI 39 KAI SYMPOSIUM ON THE CHEMISTRY OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, SYMPOSIUM PAPERS, (19970720), pages 409 - 414, XP002985348
 [A]  - BARRY M. TROST ET AL., "A synthetic approach to polyene macrolldes: Synthesis of the building blocks", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1986), vol. 27, no. 47, pages 5691 - 5694, XP002976252

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)85302-2
 [A]  - KAZUHIKO TANAKA ET AL., "New Methods for Stereoselective Synthesis of a-Alkylidene-y- butyrolactones Using Monoanion of O-Ethyl S-(Tetrahydro-2-oxo-3-furanyl) Thiocarbonate and Dianion of a-Mercapto-y-butyrolactone", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1980), vol. 53, no. 10, pages 2910 - 2916, XP008174050

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.53.2910
by applicantWO2004071503
    - SAKAMOTO, H.; OKAMOTO, K. ET AL., NAT. CHEM. BIOL., (2005), vol. 1, pages 333 - 337
    - BARRY M. TROST; HENRY. C. ARDNT, J. ORG. CHEM., (1973), vol. 38, pages 3140 - 3144
    - AMOS B. SMITH, III; RICHARD J. FOX, ORG. LETT, (2004), vol. 6, pages 1477 - 1480