Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799559

EP2799559 - INFRARED HEATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.03.2017  [2017/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd.
4-50, Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi 471-8507 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / MINEOKA Keitaro
c/o TOYODA IRON WORKS CO. LTD.
4-50 Hosoya-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8507 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12856791.425.06.2012
WO2012JP66175
Priority number, dateJP2011027512815.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275128
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088764
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799559
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C21D1/673, C21D1/34, B21D24/00, H05B3/10, C21D1/18, C21D9/46, C21D1/09, C21D1/70, C23C14/54, C23C16/48, H05B3/00, C23C16/46
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/45]C21D1/34, B21D24/00, H05B3/10, C21D1/18, C21D1/673
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:INFRAROTHEIZUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/45]
English:INFRARED HEATING DEVICE[2014/45]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE INFRAROUGE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014Translation filed 
24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
03.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH11277282  (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0015]; figure 3; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US2010014297  (IJZERMAN WILLEM LUBERTUS [NL] ET AL) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0017] - paragraphs [0018] , [ 0024]; claim 1 *;
 [Y]JP2001205470  (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009020523  (DEMICHAEL THOMAS [US] ET AL) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2011132897  (ISHIGURO KATSUNORI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0016] - paragraphs [0017] , [ 0030]; figure 5 *
International search[Y]JP2010044875  (AISIN TAKAOKA CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2001205470  (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [Y]JPH08179108  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2010044875