blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2791349


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.02.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
06.12.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.10.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
12.02.2016 Change - classification published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - classification published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
12.02.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
15.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
09.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication