blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2791349
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014349347Global Dossier 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012IB55480 10.10.2012
GB201121615 15.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2791349Global Dossier 16.03.2016A4
EP2791349 22.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012IB55480 10.10.2012
GB201121615 15.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013088267Global Dossier 20.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201121615 15.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB201121615D 25.01.2012D0
Priority number Date
GB201121615 15.12.2011