Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791349

EP2791349 - SYNTHESIS OF N-ACETYL-D-NEURAMINIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.03.2017  [2017/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glycom A/S
Diplomvej 373
2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHROVEN, Andreas
Passatweg 5
26676 Barssel / DE
02 / DEKANY, Gyula
46 Furness Crescent
Sinnamon Park, Queensland 4073 / AU
03 / VRASIDAS, Ioannis
Papapetrou 17
GR-55131 Thessaloniki / GR
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date12856808.610.10.2012
WO2012IB55480
Priority number, dateGB2011002161515.12.2011         Original published format: GB 201121615
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088267
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791349
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:C12P19/28, C12N9/88
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:SYNTHESE VON N-ACETYL-D-NEURAMINSÄURE[2014/43]
English:SYNTHESIS OF N-ACETYL-D-NEURAMINIC ACID[2014/43]
French:SYNTHÈSE D'ACIDE N-ACÉTYL-D-NEURAMINIQUE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Search fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
14.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/10]
21.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP2365089  (GLYCOFI INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0020]; figures 8,9 * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0160] * [Y] 3,7-15;
 [Y]US6156544  (DAWSON MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 7-15 * column 2, line 59 - line 61 * * column 10 - column 11 *;
 [A]US2007088157  (HUBBS JOHN C [US]) [A] 8-15 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2012140576  (GLYCOM AS [DK], et al) [E] 8-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "RecName: Full=N-acetylneuraminate lyase {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_01237, ECO:0000256|SAAS:SAAS00021647}; Short=NAL {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_01237}; Short=Neu5Ac lyase {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_01237}; EC=4.1.3.3 {ECO:0000256|HAMAP-Rule:MF_01237, ECO:0000256|SAAS:SAAS00021647}; AltName: Full=N-ac", DATABASE UniProt, Database accession no. D7ZES3, URL: EBI, XP002744910 [Y] 3,8-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - JAKAS A ET AL, "Glycation of a lysine-containing tetrapeptide by d-glucose and d-fructose-influence of different reaction conditions on the formation of Amadori/Heyns products", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 343, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.CARRES.2008.07.003, ISSN 0008-6215, (20080922), pages 2475 - 2480, (20080710), XP025474157 [Y] 8-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2008.07.003
International search[Y]US6156544  (DAWSON MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2007088157  (HUBBS JOHN C [US]);
 [Y]EP1484406  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]);
 [E]WO2012140576  (GLYCOM AS [DK], et al);
 [A]  - U. KRAGL, P. APPEL, D. GYGAX, O. GHISALBA, C. WANDREY, "ALDOLASES FOR USE IN CARBOHYDRATE SYNTHESIS: ENZYMATIC REACTION ENGINEERING AS A TOOL FOR PROCESS OPTIMIZATION", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING FOR 2001, PROCEEDINGS OF ASIA-PACIFIC BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING CONFERENCE 1992, JAPAN, (1992), pages 84 - 87, XP008174043

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-4-431-68180-9_20
 [A]  - U. KRAGL, M. KITTELMANN, O. GHISALBA, C. WANDREY., "N-ACETYLNEURAMINIC ACID: FROM A RARE CHEMICAL FROM NATURAL SOURCES TO A MULTIKILOGRAM ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS FOR INDUSTRIAL APPLICATION", AN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1995), vol. 750, pages 300 - 305, XP001022503

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1995.tb19969.x
 [A]  - M.I. GARCIA-GARCIA, A. SOLA-CARVAJAL, G. SANCHEZ-CARRON, F. GARCIA-CARMONA, A. SANCHEZ-FERRER., "NEW STABILIZED FASTPREP-CLEA'S FOR SIALIC ACID SYNTHESIS", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 102, pages 6186 - 6191, XP028407888

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2011.02.026
 [A]  - M. MAHMOUDIAN, D. NOBLE, C.S. DRAKE, R.F. MIDDLETON, D.S. MONTGOMERY, J.E. PIERCY., "AN EFFICIENT PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF N-ACETYLNEURAMINIC ACID USING N-ACETYLNEURAMINIC ACID ALDOLASE", (1997), vol. 20, pages 393 - 400, XP055154642

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(96)00180-9
 [A]  - J.F. CARSON, "REACTION OF FRUCTOSE WITH BENZYLAMINE", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1956), vol. 78, no. 15, pages 3728 - 3731, XP055092216

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01596a049
 [A]  - F. TAO, Y. ZHANG, C. MA, P. XU., "BIOTECHNOLOGICAL PRODUCTION AND APPLICATIONS OF N-ACETYL-D-NEURAMINIC ACID: CURRENT STATE AND PERSPECTIVES", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 87, pages 1281 - 1289, XP019841698