Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793414

EP2793414 - METHOD FOR MEASURING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION IN A WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SEO, Hanbyul
LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
02 / KIM, Hakseong
LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/37]
Former [2014/43]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12856809.417.12.2012
[2016/37]
WO2012KR11001
Priority number, dateUS201161576356P16.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161576356 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089530
Date:20.06.2013
Language:KO
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793414
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793414
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04L1/00, H04W24/08
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/43]H04J11/00, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANGSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2014/43]
English:METHOD FOR MEASURING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION IN A WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS SANS FIL ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014Translation filed 
18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Search fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
01.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Fee for grant paid
22.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16188520.7  / EP3131218
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2016
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2012
AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
MT17.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU17.12.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
MT17.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU17.12.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
MT17.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU17.12.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
GB17.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/49]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IE17.12.2016
LU17.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2009052754  (MEDIATEK INC [CN], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 20; figure 6 * [Y] 2-8,10-15;
 [Y]KR20110122046  (PANTECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-8,10-15 * abstract *;
 US2013051356  [ ] (HONG SUNG KWON [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0124] *
International search[X]KR20110122046  (PANTECH CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]KR20090101406  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20090069762  (POSDATA CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]WO2010049587  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al);
 [A]WO2009035399  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al)