Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792913

EP2792913 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jatco Ltd
700-1, Imaizumi
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Jatco Ltd
700-1, Imaizumi
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Hiroyasu
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
02 / INOUE, Mamiko
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
03 / NONOMURA, Ryousuke
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
04 / INOUE, Takuichiro
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
05 / ASAI, Norio
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
06 / MORI, Masato
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
07 / ISHII, Satoru
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
08 / SHINOHARA, Fumito
c/o JATCO Ltd
700-1 Imaizumi
Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date12857113.009.11.2012
WO2012JP79128
Priority number, dateJP2011027130912.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011271309
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088875
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792913
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/04
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER STEUERUNG[2014/43]
English:CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME[2014/43]
French:TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE LA COMMANDER[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014Translation filed 
02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Search fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
29.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPS63266265  (AISIN WARNER) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 6,18 * [I] 4;
 [XI]JP2002139140  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * [I] 4;
 [X]EP2275706  (JATCO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figure 11 *;
 [A]US2010075799  (SUZUKI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US2011015033  (NONOMURA RYOUSUKE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US2010248895  (JATCO LTD [JP]; NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP2233794  (JATCO LTD [JP]; NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 1 - line 5 *
International search[X]JP2011021716  (JATCO LTD.);
 [A]JP2010230118  (JATCO LTD.);
 [A]JPS63266266  (AISIN AW CO., LTD.)