Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791329

EP2791329 - POLYPEPTIDES HAVING ENDOGLUCANASE ACTIVITY AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes, Inc.
1445 Drew Avenue
Davis, CA 95616 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yu
Apt. 1607
No.1 Xinfengjie
Xicheng District
Beijing 100088 / CN
02 / DUAN, Junxin
4-9-11D Shijicheng
Yuandalu
Haidian District
Beijing 100089 / CN
03 / TANG, Lan
Zhichun Road 57-1-707
Haidian District
Beijing 100080 / CN
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Rasmussen, Preben
Novozymes A/S
Patents
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12857196.514.12.2012
WO2012CN86680
Priority number, dateWO2011CN8409315.12.2011         Original published format: PCT/CN2011/084093
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087029
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791329
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/42, C12N15/56, C12N15/63, C12N15/82, C12N1/15, C12N5/14, C12N15/113, C12P19/02, C12P19/14, A01H1/00
[2015/41]
Former International [2014/43]C12N9/42, C12N15/56, C12N15/63, C12N15/82, C12N1/15, C12N5/14, C12N15/113, C12P19/00, A01H1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:POLYPEPTIDE MIT ENDOGLUCANASE-AKTIVITÄT UND POLYNUKLEOTIDE ZU IHRER KODIERUNG[2014/43]
English:POLYPEPTIDES HAVING ENDOGLUCANASE ACTIVITY AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME[2014/43]
French:POLYPEPTIDES PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ D'ENDOGLUCANASE ET POLYNUCLÉOTIDES CODANT POUR CEUX-CI[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2014National basic fee paid 
15.07.2014Search fee paid 
15.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
12.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/51]
17.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010159509  (XU FENG [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-15 * page 1 - page 32; sequences 21,22 * [I] 2;
 [XI]WO2011059740  (NOVOZYMES INC [US]; NOVOZYMES AS [DK]; BROWN KIMBERLY [US]; ABBATE ERI) [X] 1,3-15 * page 2 - page 62; sequences 13,14 * [I] 2;
 [XI]WO2007109441  (NOVOZYMES INC [US]; NOVOZYMES AS [DK]; HARRIS PAUL [US]; VLASENKO ELEN) [X] 6 * page 2, line 28 - line 35; claims 1-55 * * page 20, line 30 - line 36 * * page 22, line 20 * [I] 1-5,7-15;
 [A]  - KUDRYASHOVA E V ET AL, "Stabilization of alkaline proteinase and cellulases via complex formation with chitosan for use as detergent components", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (200905), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 1068-1620, pages 335 - 341, XP002741928 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S106816200903008X
 [A]  - OBERSON J ET AL, "Comparative investigation of cellulose-degrading enzyme systems produced by different strains of Myceliophthora thermophila (Apinis) v. Oorschot", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0141-0229(92)90156-I, ISSN 0141-0229, (19920401), pages 303 - 312, (19920401), XP024102319 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(92)90156-I
 [XI]  - "SubName: Full=Pc22g19230 protein {ECO:0000313|EMBL:CAP99211.1};", UniProt, (20081216), Database accession no. B6HVQ6, URL: EBI, XP002752706 [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [I] 6-15
    [ ] - VAN DEN BERG MARCO A ET AL, "Genome sequencing and analysis of the filamentous fungus Penicillium chrysogenum", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (20081001), vol. 26, no. 10, doi:10.1038/NBT.1498, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1161 - 1168, XP002519165 [ ] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1498
 [XA]  - COPA-PATINO J L ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF 1 3-BETA GLUCANASES PRODUCED DURING AUTOLYSIS OF PENICILLIUM-OXALICUM IN DIFFERENT CULTURE MEDIA", TRANSACTIONS OF THE BRITISH MYCOLOGICAL SOCIETY, (1987), vol. 88, no. 3, ISSN 0007-1536, pages 317 - 322, XP002752707 [X] 6,7 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,8-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-1536(87)80004-9
International search[X]CN101454444  (NOVOZYMES AS)
 [X]  - "RECNAME: FULL=ENDOGLUCANASE 1; ALTNAME: FULL=CARBOXYMETHYL-CELLULASE I; SHORT=CMCASE I; ALTNAME: FULL=ENDO-1,4-BETA-GLUCANASE; ALTNAME: FULL=ENDOGLUCANASE I; FLAGS: PRECURSOR", GENBANK, (20110921), URL: N N N Y, XP055163506