blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2790698 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2790698



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 228
16.12.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.12.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
20.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
30.07.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
17.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.05.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 84
20.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 104