blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2790698


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.12.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
19.08.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
05.02.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
19.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication