Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790698

EP2790698 - AUTOIMMUNE DISORDER TREATMENT USING RXR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.01.2016  [2016/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IO Therapeutics, Inc.
25241 Buckskin Drive
Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US
For all designated states
Trustees of Dartmouth College
11 Rope Ferry Road
Hanover, NH 03766 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / CHANDRARATNA, Roshantha, A.
25241 Buckskin Drive
Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US
02 / DMITROVSKY, Ethan
35 East Wheelock Street
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
03 / NOWAK, Elizabeth
3 Meadowbrook Vlg Apt. 14
West Lebanon, NH 03784 / US
04 / NOELLE, Randolph
301 Freeman Road
Plainfield, NH 03781 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Application number, filing date12857218.713.12.2012
WO2012US69566
Priority number, dateUS201161570182P13.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161570182 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090616
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790698
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/435, A61K31/353, A61K31/35, A61K31/34, A61P37/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN MIT RXR-AGONISTEN[2014/43]
English:AUTOIMMUNE DISORDER TREATMENT USING RXR AGONISTS[2014/43]
French:TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLE AUTO-IMMUN À L'AIDE D'AGONISTES RXR[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Search fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
01.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/01]
20.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007078129  (LAGU BHARAT [US], et al);
 [X]WO2007041076  (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al);
 [X]WO2011006157  (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US], et al);
 [A]JP2010280585  (UNIV OKAYAMA);
 [A]US2009136470  (CHEROUTRE HILDE [US], et al)