Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792344

EP2792344 - MEDICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / IMAI, Masaomi
c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
1500 Inokuchi
Nakai-machi
Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12857252.629.11.2012
[2017/19]
WO2012JP80948
Priority number, dateJP2011027500015.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275000
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088970
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792344
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792344
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/20
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/43]A61J3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHES INSTRUMENT[2014/43]
English:MEDICAL INSTRUMENT[2014/43]
French:INSTRUMENT MÉDICAL[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2014Translation filed 
04.06.2014National basic fee paid 
04.06.2014Search fee paid 
04.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
15.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2017Fee for grant paid
28.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2016
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.11.2012
AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
GB29.11.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/50]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
GB29.11.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/49]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]JP2001508680  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS (S.A.));
 [Y]JPS6423475U  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.);
 [Y]US2007108205  (BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.);
 [Y]JP2000344265  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD.)
by applicantWO2010089388