Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2801131 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2801131



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
24.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
20.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
17.01.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.09.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.08.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 5
18.01.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
02.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
02.10.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
18.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
10.10.2014 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
24.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
25.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
20.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 55