Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2801131


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.05.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
11.01.2017 Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.01.2016 Change - classification published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - classification published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
10.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
02.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2014 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
02.10.2014 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
15.09.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication