Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801131

EP2801131 - SOLID STATE LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2017  [2017/24]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LT  NO  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
Prad Research And Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LT  NO  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
Prad Research And Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
Inventor(s)01 / SPECK, Andrew
84 Beacon Street Circle
Milton, MA 02186 / US
02 / ANDREWS, Albert Ballard
133 Indian Hill Road
Wilton, CT 06897 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Rzaniak, Martin
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger
Intellectual Property Law Department
1, rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202
92142 Clamart / FR
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date12857402.706.12.2012
WO2012US68125
Priority number, dateUS201161570550P14.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161570550 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090108
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801131
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/65, G01N21/71, H01S3/06, H01S3/113
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/46]H01S3/09, H01S3/098, H01S3/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:FESTKÖRPERLASER[2014/46]
English:SOLID STATE LASERS[2014/46]
French:LASERS À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.09.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/46]
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
17.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/24]
20.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2017/24]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
25.09.2014Request for further processing filed
25.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.10.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4577110  (MACBRIDE WILLIAM R [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 7, line 23 - line 63; figure 1 *;
 [I]US5867266  (CRAIGHEAD HAROLD G [US]) [I] 1-6 * column 8, line 11 - column 9, line 8; figure 6 *;
 [I]US2007076199  (ODE TAKAHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0054] , [0060] , [0066] , [0067]; figure 8 *
International search[X]US2010195679  (GERHARD KROUPA ET AL.);
 [Y]US2008149819  (OLEG ZHDANEEV);
 [A]US2003169414  (PAUL BENZ ET AL.);
 [A]US2002094007  (BRIAN LEE PETERSON ET AL.);
 [A]US2008247425  (DAVID WELFORD)