Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792685

EP2792685 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING A DIALYZABLE LEUKOCYTE EXTRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Instituto Politecnico Nacional
U.P. Adolfo López Mateos
Zacatenco, Del. Gustavo A. Madero
07738 México D.F. / MX
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / ESTRADA PARRA, Sergio
Prolongación de Carpio Esquina Plan de Ayala S/N
Col. Santo Tomás
C.P. 11340 México D.F / MX
02 / ESTRADA GARCÍA, Iris Citlati Elvira
Prolongación de Carpio Esquina Plan de Ayala S/N
Col. Santo Tomás
C.P. 11340 México D.F / MX
03 / PÉREZ TAPIA, Sonia Mayra
Prolongación de Carpio Esquina Plan de Ayala S/N
Col. Santo Tomás
C.P. 11340 México D.F / MX
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/26]
Former [2014/43]Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12857547.917.12.2012
[2018/26]
WO2012MX00129
Priority number, dateMX2011001385216.12.2011         Original published format: MX 2011013852
[2014/43]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089550
Date:20.06.2013
Language:ES
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792685
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792685
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/52, C07K1/16, C07K1/36
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DIALYSIERBAREN LEUKOZYTENEXTRAKTS[2014/43]
English:METHOD FOR OBTAINING A DIALYZABLE LEUKOCYTE EXTRACT[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'EXTRAIT DIALYSABLE DE LEUCOCYTES[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014Translation filed 
23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
22.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2018Fee for grant paid
18.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2016
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIS27.10.2018
[2019/08]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9740159  (CYTOKINE SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 2 * examples 1, 5, 30 * [Y] 1,2;
 [XY]EP0143445  (AMTRON [US]) [X] 2 * page 17, paragraph 3; claims 2,3, 37, 39 * [Y] 1,2;
 [XY]EP0109089  (GOTTLIEB ARTHUR A) [X] 2 * page 47; example 2 * [Y] 1,2;
 [XY]  - LAWTON J W M ET AL, "Human transfer factor prepared by dialysis, ultrafiltration and gel chromatography: Biological activity in local transfer of skin sensitivity", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0022-1759(77)90047-3, ISSN 0022-1759, (19770601), pages 119 - 129, (19770601), XP024017701 [X] 2 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(77)90047-3
 [XY]  - ARMIDES FRANCO-MOLINA MOISÉS ET AL, "In vitro antibacterial activity of bovine dialyzable leukocyte extract.", IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY AND IMMUNOTOXICOLOGY 2006, (2006), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0892-3973, pages 471 - 483, XP009183418 [X] 2 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08923970600928072
 [T]  - MEDINA-RIVERO EMILIO ET AL, "Batch-to-batch reproducibility of Transferon", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (20130917), vol. 88, doi:10.1016/J.JPBA.2013.09.004, ISSN 0731-7085, pages 289 - 294, XP028783042

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2013.09.004
International search[X]WO9200093  (NAT JEWISH CT IMMUN & RESPIRAT);
 [X]US2002044942  (DOPSON MINTER H);
 [X]DE3244607  (BEZIRKSBLUTSPENDEZENTRALE PLAU);
 [X]WO9712915  (INST POLITECNICO NACIONAL ET AL.)
Examination   - Anonymous, "Factor de Transferencia-Transferón ", (20090101), URL: http://www.factordetransferenciaipn.com.mx/, (20160414), XP055265319
    - MEDINA-RIVERO EMILIO ET AL, "Physicochemical Characteristics of Transferon(TM) Batches.", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL 2016, (2016), vol. 2016, ISSN 2314-6141, page 7935181
    - HERNANDEZ MARÍA EUGENIA ET AL, "Effect of selective serotonin reuptake inhibitors and immunomodulator on cytokines levels: an alternative therapy for patients with major depressive disorder.", CLINICAL & DEVELOPMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY 2013, (2013), vol. 2013, ISSN 1740-2530, page 267871
    - Concepcion Santacruz ET AL, "Dialyzable Leukocyte extracts (Transfer factor) as adjuvant therapy for fungal keratitis", The American Journal of case Reports 11, (20100101), pages 97 - 101, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/235950554_Dialyzable_Leukocyte_extracts_Transfer_factor_as_adjuvant_therapy_for_fungal_keratitis, (20160921), XP055304287
    - CARDOSO F M ET AL, "New and cost effective cell-based assay for Dialyzed Leukocyte Extract (DLE)-induced Jurkat cells proliferation under azathioprine treatment", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (20170131), vol. 138, doi:10.1016/J.JPBA.2017.01.052, ISSN 0731-7085, pages 100 - 108, XP029949113

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2017.01.052
    - SALINAS-JAZMÍN NOHEMÍ ET AL, "Herpes murine model as a biological assay to test dialyzable leukocyte extracts activity.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH 2015, (2015), vol. 2015, ISSN 2314-7156, page 146305
by applicantUS4816563
 US5080895
 US5840700
 US5883224
 US6468534
 WO2007143957
 US2003031686
 US2002044942
 EP0143445