EP2792937 - VEHICLE LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 4-8-3, Takanawa Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Takeshi c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-Shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 02 /
SHIBATA, Yuichi c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-Shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Naoki c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-Shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 04 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuyuki c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-Shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 12857596.6 | 04.12.2012 | WO2012JP07773 | Priority number, date | JP20110274708 | 15.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011274708 | [2014/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013088673 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792937 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, F21V13/06, F21Y101/02, // B60Q1/068, B60Q1/08, B60Q11/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
F21S41/16 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0023 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0683 (EP,US);
B60Q1/085 (EP,US);
B60Q11/00 (EP,US);
F21S41/125 (EP,US);
F21S41/176 (EP,US);
F21S41/20 (US);
F21S41/321 (EP,US);
F21S41/365 (EP,US);
F21S41/675 (EP,US);
F21S45/70 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/146 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/20 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/32 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | F21S8/10, F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLICHT | [2014/43] | English: | VEHICLE LIGHT | [2014/43] | French: | PHARE DE VÉHICULE | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2014 | Translation filed | 11.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102008022795 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2007297171 (BERBEN DIRK [DE], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0036]; figures 3-6 *; | [X]JP2011157022 (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0043] - [0065]; figures 1-21 * | International search | [Y]JP2009048786 (KOITO MFG CO LTD); | [Y]WO2010039351 (MICROVISION INC [US], et al); | [Y]JP2010134360 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2005150041 |