Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793240

EP2793240 - SUPERCONDUCTING CABLE, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COOLING SUPERCONDUCTING CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Railway Technical Research Institute
2-8-38 Hikari-cho
Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8540 / JP
[2014/46]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Mayekawa Mfg. Co., Ltd.
14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku
Tokyo 135-8482 / JP
For all designated states
Railway Technical Research Institute
2-8-38 Hikari-cho
Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8540 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAMADA, Noriharu
C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO. LTD.
14-15 Botan 3-chome
Koto-ku
Tokyo 135-8482 / JP
02 / TOMITA, Masaru
C/O RAILWAY TECHNICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE
2-8-38 Hikari-cho
Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185-8540 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2016/20]
Former [2014/43]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date12857601.414.12.2012
[2016/20]
WO2012JP82469
Priority number, dateJP2011027375014.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011273750
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089219
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793240
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793240
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01B12/16, H01B12/14, H01L39/04
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUPRALEITENDES KABEL SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN DES SUPRALEITENDEN KABELS[2014/43]
English:SUPERCONDUCTING CABLE, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COOLING SUPERCONDUCTING CABLE[2014/43]
French:CÂBLE SUPRACONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN CÂBLE SUPRACONDUCTEUR[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014Translation filed 
04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Search fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
27.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2016Fee for grant paid
24.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2012
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU14.12.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU14.12.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU14.12.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU14.12.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE14.12.2016
LU14.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2000118270  (RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST) [A] 1,9 * figure 3b *;
 [A]JP2009009908  (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *
International search[X]JP2011076750  (FUJIKURA LTD.);
 [Y]JP2002056729  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011054500  (MAYEKAWA MFG., CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH0714443  (CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC.);
 [A]JPH08287750  (FUJIKURA LTD.);
 [A]JP2009009908  (MAYEKAWA MFG., CO., LTD.)