Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793499

EP2793499 - WIRELESS PARAMETER CONTROL SYSTEM, WIRELESS PARAMETER CONTROL DEVICE, WIRELESS BASE STATION, WIRELESS PARAMETER CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2019/04]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Kosei
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1
shiba 5 chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 1088001 / JP
02 / SUGAHARA, Hiroto
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1
shiba 5 chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 1088001 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12857687.310.12.2012
[2019/04]
WO2012JP81923
Priority number, dateJP2011027182813.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011271828
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089058
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793499
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793499
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/18, H04W24/02
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES PARAMETERSTEUERSYSTEM, DRAHTLOSE PARAMETERSTEUERVORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATION, DRAHTLOSES PARAMETERSTEUERVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR[2014/43]
English:WIRELESS PARAMETER CONTROL SYSTEM, WIRELESS PARAMETER CONTROL DEVICE, WIRELESS BASE STATION, WIRELESS PARAMETER CONTROL METHOD AND PROGRAM[2014/43]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE PARAMÈTRE SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PARAMÈTRE SANS FIL, STATION DE BASE SANS FIL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PARAMÈTRE SANS FIL ET PROGRAMME[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014Translation filed 
24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2018Fee for grant paid
19.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0072618  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 10 * * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 35 * [I] 3-11;
 [X]WO2004082154  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]; MARINIER PAUL [CA]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0037] *
International search[A]JP2011044808  (NEC CORP.)