Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793280

EP2793280 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT MATERIAL AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumikin Chemical Co., Ltd.
14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TADA Masashi
c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd.
46-80 Oaza Nakabaru Sakinohama
Tobata-ku
Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP
02 / KAI Takahiro
c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd.
46-80 Oaza Nakabaru Sakinohama
Tobata-ku
Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP
03 / ASARI Tohru
c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd.
46-80 Oaza Nakabaru Sakinohama
Tobata-ku
Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP
04 / OGAWA Junya
c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Chemical Co. Ltd.
46-80 Oaza Nakabaru Sakinohama
Tobata-ku
Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/13]
Former [2014/43]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12857845.722.11.2012
[2017/13]
WO2012JP80303
Priority number, dateJP2011027117312.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011271173
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088934
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793280
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793280
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/54, C07F19/00, C09K11/06, C07F5/02, C07F7/08, H05B33/20
[2016/43]
Former International [2015/37]H01L51/50, C07F19/00, C09K11/06, C07F5/02, C07F7/08, H05B33/20
Former International [2014/43]H01L51/50, C07F19/00, C09K11/06, C07F5/02, C07F7/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MATERIAL FÜR EIN ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT UND ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT, DAS DIESES VERWENDET[2017/12]
English:ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT MATERIAL AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT USING SAME[2014/43]
French:MATÉRIAU D'ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE QUI UTILISE CE DERNIER[2014/43]
Former [2014/43]MATERIAL FÜR EIN ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT UND ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT DAMIT
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014Translation filed 
14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Search fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
04.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2017Fee for grant paid
02.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2016
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE22.11.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2018/49]
Former [2018/45]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE22.11.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
LU22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
LU22.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - STELVIO PAPETTI ET AL, "A New Series of Organoboranes. V. Some Chemistry of Cyclic Silyl Carboranes", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19641001), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.1021/ic50020a023, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 1444 - 1447, XP055197340 [X] 1,2,4 * compound VIII * [I] 3

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic50020a023
 [A]  - WANG ET AL, "Synthesis, characterization, and reactions of 6,13-disubstituted 2,3,9,10-tetrakis(trimethylsilyl)pentacene derivatives", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070727), vol. 63, no. 35, doi:10.1016/J.TET.2007.04.052, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 8586 - 8597, XP022173635 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2007.04.052
International search[A]US2011147722  (HAWKER CRAIG J [US], et al);
 [A]JP2005166574  (CANON KK)
 [X]  - YU-MAN WANG ET AL., "Synthesis, characterization, and reactions of 6,13- disubstituted 2,3,9,10-tetrakis(trimethylsilyl) pentacene derivatives", TETRAHEDRON, (20070827), vol. 63, no. ISSUE, pages 8586 - 8597, XP022173635

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2007.04.052
 [X]  - JOSEPH J. PETERSON ET AL., "INVESTIGATING CARBORANES IN CONJUGATED POLYMERS", POLYMER PREPRINTS, (20100821), vol. 51, no. 2, page 545, XP055156941
 [A]  - BARADA PRASANNA DASH ET AL., "Synthesis and Properties of Carborane-Appended C3-Symmetrical Extended n Systems", JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20100304), vol. 132, no. 18, pages 6578 - 6587, XP055156942

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja101845m
by applicantJP2003515897
 WO0141512
 JP2005166574
 JP2011213643
 WO2009073245
 WO2009046266
 WO2007095118
 WO2008156879
 WO2008140657
 US2008261076
 JP2008542203
 WO2008054584
 JP2008505925
 JP2007522126
 JP2004506305
 JP2006513278
 JP2006050596
 WO2006046980
 WO2005113704
 US2005260449
 US2005260448
 US2005214576
 WO2005076380
 US2005119485
 WO2004045001
 WO2004045000
 WO2006100888
 WO2007004380
 WO2007023659
 WO2008035664
 JP2003272861
 JP2004111193
 JP2004319438
 JP2007002080
 JP2007009009
 JP2007227948
 JP2008091906
 JP2008311607
 JP2009019121
 JP2009046601
 JP2009114369
 JP2003253128
 JP2003253129
 JP2003253145
 JP2005038847
 JP2005082598
 JP2005139185
 JP2005187473
 JP2005220136
 JP2006063080
 JP2006104201
 JP2006111623
 JP2006213720
 JP2006290891
 JP2006298899
 JP2006298900
 WO2007018067
 WO2007058080
 WO2007058104
 JP2006131561
 JP2008239565
 JP2008266163
 JP2009057367
 JP2002117978
 JP2003123982
 JP2003133074
 JP2006093542
 JP2006131524
 JP2006261623
 JP2006303383
 JP2006303394
 JP2006310479
 JP2007088105
 JP2007258550
 JP2007324309
 JP2008270737
 JP2009096800
 JP2009161524
 WO2008050733
 JP2003073387
 JP2004059433
 JP2004155709
 JP2006104132
 JP2008037848
 JP2008133212
 JP2009057304
 JP2009286716
 JP2010083852
 JP2009532546
 JP2009536681
 JP2009542026
    - J. ORG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 64, page 1045
    - INORG. CHEM., (2011), vol. 50, page 5485
    - ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2009), vol. 21, pages 4802 - 4806
    - ADV. MATER., (2009), vol. 21, pages 4802 - 4806
    - APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2011), vol. 98, page 083302
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2012), vol. 134, pages 14706 - 14709