Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785117

EP2785117 - DOWNLINK SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/42]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Ziyan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / ZENG, Yongmei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / DUAN, Xiaoming
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12857964.613.12.2012
[2017/42]
WO2012CN86564
Priority number, dateCN20111041504213.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110415042
[2014/40]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087000
Date:20.06.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785117
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785117
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/14, H04W88/08, H04B1/04
[2015/05]
Former International [2014/40]H04W52/14, H04W88/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DOWNLINK-SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/40]
English:DOWNLINK SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE AND PROCESSING METHOD THEREOF[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014Translation filed 
24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
03.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2017Fee for grant paid
25.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2016
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.12.2012
AT18.10.2017
CY18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE13.12.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU13.12.2012
AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE13.12.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2019/30]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE13.12.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE13.12.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/49]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE13.12.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE13.12.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]CN201167390Y  (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]CN201656980U  (STONE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD Z) [X] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [I]US5546443  (RAITH ALEX K [SE]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * column 7, line 20 - column 14, line 5 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [I]EP1217759  (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 2, 7 *
International search[XP]CN102438302  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [X]CN1258972  (NEC CORP.);
 [Y]CN1918814  (BROADCOM CORP.)