EP2792348 - COMPOSITION OF AN AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF POLYMERIC NANOPARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samyang Biopharmaceuticals Corporation 263, Yeonji-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-725 / KR | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sa-Won 502-1001 Yeolmae Maeul 5 Danji Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-770 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Joong-Woong 210-803 Daewoo Prugio Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-742 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Gyeong-Hae 2-1002 Younggwang Apt. Hwaseo 1-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-151 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Min-Hyo 204-707 Gukhwa Apt. Dunsan-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-782 / KR | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2020/42] |
Former [2014/43] | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12857983.6 | 07.12.2012 | [2020/42] | WO2012KR10637 | Priority number, date | KR20110136809 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: KR 20110136809 | [2014/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013089394 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2792348 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2792348 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K9/16, A61K47/34, A61K47/30 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/5146 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K47/34 (KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K47/30 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN LÖSUNG AUS POLYMERNANOPARTIKELN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2014/43] | English: | COMPOSITION OF AN AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF POLYMERIC NANOPARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2014/43] | French: | COMPOSITION D'UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE DE NANOPARTICULES POLYMÈRES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2014 | Translation filed | 07.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 23.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2012 | AL | 14.10.2020 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | ES | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | PL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | TR | 14.10.2020 | IE | 07.12.2020 | LU | 07.12.2020 | FR | 14.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | GB | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MK | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
TR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
TR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
TR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GB | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
FR | 14.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
LU | 07.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 07.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1780865 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2010203114 (KWON GLEN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0089] * * example -; claim - * [I] 3,7,8; | [XI]US2011257253 (SEO MIN HYO [KR], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * example -; claim - * * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] - [0037] - [0 67] - [0086] * [I] 10 | International search | [A]KR100560069B (AMOREPACIFIC GROUP); | [X]KR100703872B (SAMYANG HOLDINGS CORPORATION); | [A]KR100704548B (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A]KR20100057007 (KWON GLEN S [US], et al); | [X] - SA-WON, LEE ET AL., "Ionically fixed polymeric nanoparticles as a novel drug carrier", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 1508 - 1516, XP019507253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-007-9269-5 | by applicant | WO03033592 |