Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792430

EP2792430 - GEAR ROLLING METHOD USING CIRCULAR DIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGATA Eiri
c/o intellectual Property Department
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi
Aichi 448-8650 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12858029.704.12.2012
[2017/26]
WO2012JP81359
Priority number, dateJP2011027617316.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011276173
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088993
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792430
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792430
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B21H5/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GETRIEBEWALZVERFAHREN MIT KREISFÖRMIGEN MATRIZEN[2014/43]
English:GEAR ROLLING METHOD USING CIRCULAR DIES[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ROULER DES DENTURES AU MOYEN DE FILIÈRES RONDES[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014Translation filed 
31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Search fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
28.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2017Fee for grant paid
22.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2012
AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
GB04.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
GB04.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
GB04.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
GB04.12.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011302783  (NAGATA EIRI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1-2 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]JP2003340542  (SHOWA CORP; NISSEE KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2,3
International search[X]JPS3310773B  (MITSUBISHI ZOSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [Y]JP2005193302  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LABORATORIES, INC.)
by applicantJP2010075963