Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790714

EP2790714 - METHODS AND USES OF ANP (ATRIAL NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE), BNP (BRAIN NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE) AND CNP (C-TYPE NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE)-RELATED PEPTIDES AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF FOR TREATMENT OF RETINAL DISORDERS AND DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kalos Therapeutics, Inc.
4370 La Jolla Village Drive Ste 400
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / KOZLOWSKI, Michael
6315 W Lone CactusDrive
Glendale, AZ 85308 / US
 [2015/18]
Former [2014/45]01 / KOZLOWSKI, Michael
28405 N. 128th Drive
Peoria, AZ 85383 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12858180.817.12.2012
WO2012US70190
Priority number, dateUS201161576720P16.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161576720 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013090931
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790714
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU31.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61P27/02, A61P27/10, A61K38/22, A61K9/00
[2015/30]
Former International [2014/43]A61K38/02, C07K14/58, A61P27/02, A61P27/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN VON ANP- (NATRIURETISCHES PEPTID DES TYPS A), BNP- (NATRIURETISCHES PEPTID DES TYPS B) UND CNP- (NATRIURETISCHES PEPTID DES TYPS C) VERWANDTEN PEPTIDEN UND DERIVATEN DAVON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RETINALEN STÖRUNGEN UND ERKRANKUNGEN[2014/43]
English:METHODS AND USES OF ANP (ATRIAL NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE), BNP (BRAIN NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE) AND CNP (C-TYPE NATRIURETIC PEPTIDE)-RELATED PEPTIDES AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF FOR TREATMENT OF RETINAL DISORDERS AND DISEASES[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS DE PEPTIDES ASSOCIÉS À ANP (PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE ATRIAL), BNP (PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE DU CERVEAU) ET CNP (PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE DE TYPE C) ET DE LEURS DÉRIVÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES ET MALADIES DE LA RÉTINE[2019/18]
Former [2014/43]PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS DE PEPTIDES SSOCIÉS À ANP (PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE ATRIAL), BNP (PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE DU CERVEAU) ET CNP (PEPTIDE NATRIURÉTIQUE DE TYPE C) ET DE LEURS DÉRIVÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES ET MALADIES DE LA RÉTINE
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
01.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.10.2017Request for further processing filed
23.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.11.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]  - FERNANDEZ-DURANGO R ET AL, "Identification and characterization of atrial natriuretic factor receptors in the rat retina", LIFE SCIENCES, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 44, no. 24, doi:10.1016/0024-3205(89)90301-9, ISSN 0024-3205, (19890101), pages 1837 - 1846, (19890101), XP025566762 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(89)90301-9
 [A]  - ROLLÍN RAQUEL ET AL, "Natriuretic peptide system in the human retina.", MOLECULAR VISION 9 JAN 2004, (20040109), vol. 10, ISSN 1090-0535, pages 15 - 22, XP002740649 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009238817  (KALOS THERAPEUTICS);
 [Y]  - NURIA LARA-CASTILLO ET AL., "Atrial Natriuretic Peptide Reduces Vascular Leakage and Choroidal Neovascularization", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200912), vol. 175, no. 6, pages 2343 - 2350, XP055157042

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/ajpath.2009.090439
 [A]  - XINYUAN ZHANG ET AL., "Aportosis and Cell Proliferation in Proliferative Retinal Disorders; PCNA, Ki-67, Caspase-3, and PARP Expression", CURRENT EYE RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 30, pages 395 - 403, XP008097284

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02713680590956306
 [A]  - HUGGERT A., "Experiences about some means of avoiding enucleation for suspected intraocular tumours", ACTA OPHTHALMOLOGICA, (1969), vol. 47, pages 596 - 604, XP055157046

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1755-3768.1969.tb08146.x
by applicantUS2007049251
 WO8705330
 US4640835
 US4496689
 US4301144
 US4670417
 US4791192
 US4179337
 US6087329
 US4522811
    - BALDINI et al., Melanoma Res., (20060000), vol. 16, pages 501 - 507
    - LELIEVRE et al., J. Biol. Chem, (20010000), vol. 276, no. 47, page 43668
    - LEVIN et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19910000), vol. 30, pages R453 - R457
    - VESELY, D.L., Eur J Clin Invest, (20080000), vol. 38, no. 8, page 562
    - BALDINI et al., Cell Death Diff., (20040000), vol. 11, pages S210 - S212
    - BALDINI et al., Melanoma Res., (20060000), vol. 16, page 501
    - GOWER et al., Mol. Cell Biochem, (20060000), vol. 293, page 103
    - LEVIN E.R.; FRANK, H.J.L., Am. J. Physiol., (19910000), vol. 30, pages R453 - R457
    - HASHIM, S.; LI, Y; ANAND-SRIVASTAVA, M.B., Am. J. Heart Cir. Physiol, (20060000), vol. 291, pages H3144 - H3153
    - DHILLON et al., Oncogen, (20070000), vol. 26, page 3279
    - HE, X-L. et al., Science, (20010000), vol. 293, page 1657
    - MOFFATT et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, page 36454
    - POTTER et al., Endocrine Rev., (20060000), vol. 27, page 47
    - HE et al., Science, (20010000), vol. 293, page 1657
    - NISHIZAWA, H. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, page 19391
    - COLLINSON, P.O., Bus. Brief. Eur. Cardiol, (20050000), vol. 66
    - HASHIM et al., Am. J. Heart Cir. Physiol, (20060000), vol. 291, pages H3144 - H3153
    - LELIEVRE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, page 43668
    - PANAYIOTOU et al., Proc. Brit. Pharm. Soc, (20050000), vol. 41
    - PRINS et al., J. Bio. Chem., (19960000), vol. 271, page 14156
    - SEGAWA et al., Naun.-Schmeid. Arch. Pharmacol., (19980000), vol. 357, page 70
    - VESELY, D.L., Eur J Clin Invest, (20080000), vol. 38, page 562
    - ALEXANDER, L.J., Primary Care of the Posterior Segment, McGraw Hill, (20020000), pages 94 - 98
    - CIULLA, T.A.; ROSENFELD, P.J., Curr Opin Ophthalmol, (20090000), vol. 20, page 158
    - "Etiology of late-age-related macular disease", SPAIDE, R. et al., Age related macular degeneration: A comprehensive textbook, Lippincott, Williams and Wilkins, (20060000), pages 23 - 39
    - APLIN; WRISTON, CRC Crit. Rev. Biochem., (19810000), page 259
    - HAKIMUDDIN et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (19870000), vol. 259, page 52
    - EDGE et al., Anal. Biochem., (19810000), vol. 118, page 131
    - THOTAKURA et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 138, page 350