Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2790714


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.10.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.08.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.04.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.03.2019 Change - French title published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.05.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2017 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
27.10.2017 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.10.2017 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
25.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.08.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.05.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.03.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
06.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.02.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
01.02.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.01.2017 First examination report
05.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
05.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2015 Supplementary search report published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
19.06.2015 Change - classification published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
19.06.2015 Change - classification published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
27.03.2015 Change - inventor published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
20.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Change - inventor published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
19.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication