Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790801

EP2790801 - A CROSS-COUNTRY SKI FOR PRACTICING CLASSIC CROSS-COUNTRY SKIING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cedervall, Mats
Seminariegatan 7A
871 31 Härnösand / SE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Kånge, Lars Rikard
Awapatent AB
Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12858291.317.12.2012
WO2012SE51416
Priority number, dateSE2011003012116.12.2011         Original published format: SE 1130121
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089637
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790801
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A63C5/07, A63C7/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:LANGLAUFSKI FÜR KLASSISCHEN SKILANGLAUF[2014/43]
English:A CROSS-COUNTRY SKI FOR PRACTICING CLASSIC CROSS-COUNTRY SKIING[2014/43]
French:SKI DE FOND POUR LA PRATIQUE DU SKI DE FOND CLASSIQUE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Search fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
17.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
24.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5427400  (BEJEAN ALAIN [FR]) [XD] 1 * figures 1-13 *;
 [X]DE4240342  (GEITH MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3418604  (ERIKSSON KARL G V) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2556975  (TMC CORP [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]WO9531259  (SALOMON SA ET AL);
 [A]US4262924  (CORWIN CHARLES H);
 [A]US4754989  (HOELZL KLAUS);
 [A]US5829776  (DEVILLE DOMINIQUE ET AL);
 [A]US2011278824  (POPEL JIRI)