Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791793

EP2791793 - PROVIDING UPDATE NOTIFICATIONS ON DISTRIBUTED APPLICATION OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/19]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHI, Alan
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / PARTHASARATHY, Srivatsan
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / BERERA, Biddappa Nanaiah
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / NAIR, Rajeet
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / MALHOTRA, Rakesh
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / MICHAEL, Michael
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
07 / WINNER, Eric Joseph
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12858340.805.12.2012
WO2012US67814
Priority number, dateUS20111332687815.12.2011         Original published format: US201113326878
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090066
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791793
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, G06F9/455
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/43]G06F9/44, G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:BEREITSTELLUNG VON AKTUALISIERUNGSMELDUNGEN AUF VERTEILTEN ANWENDUNGSOBJEKTEN[2014/43]
English:PROVIDING UPDATE NOTIFICATIONS ON DISTRIBUTED APPLICATION OBJECTS[2014/43]
French:FOURNITURE DE NOTIFICATIONS DE MISE À JOUR SUR DES OBJETS D'APPLICATION RÉPARTIE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
07.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2007234337  (SUZUKI AARON T [US], et al) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0058] - [0068]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0115] - [0129]; figures 9, 10a * [A] 1-8,10;
 [A]US2009007105  (FRIES ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0070]; figures 3,4,7 *
 [XA]  - Glenn Ammons ET AL, "Virtual machine images as structured data: the Mirage image library", Proceedings of the 3rd USENIX conference on Hot topics in cloud computing (HotCloud'11), Portland, OR, USA, (20110615), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.usenix.org/events/hotcloud11/tech/final_files/Ammons.pdf, (20150529), XP055192509 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, column l, lines 26-32; figure 1 * * page 2, column r, line 30 - page 3, column l, line 13; figure 2 * * page 5, column l, lines 1-20; figure 3 * [A] 3-10
International search[A]US2004187103  (WICKHAM ROBERT T [US], et al);
 [A]US2006265688  (CARLSON BRENT A [US], et al);
 [A]US2007150882  (PENA RONNY A [US], et al);
 [A]US2003172368  (ALUMBAUGH ELIZABETH [US], et al)