Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793377

EP2793377 - MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR FIELD POLE MAGNET BODY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/43]MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR FIELD POLE MAGNET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR
[2017/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2017/37]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUSHITA, Yasushi
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / WATANABE, Hideki
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / SEKIKAWA, Takashi
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / NISHIMURA, Kimio
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
05 / TAKAICHI, Kazuhiro
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
06 / HORI, Akihisa
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
07 / OHSHIMA, Takumi
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
08 / KISHI, Michito
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
09 / ISHIGURO, Kunitomo
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2017/37]
Former [2014/43]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date12858370.519.11.2012
[2017/37]
WO2012JP79913
Priority number, dateJP2011027322214.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011273222
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088911
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793377
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793377
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02K15/03, H01F41/02
[2017/17]
Former International [2016/08]H02K15/03
Former International [2014/43]H02K15/03, H02K1/27, H02K21/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FELDPOLMAGNET UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/43]
English:MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR FIELD POLE MAGNET BODY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SAME[2017/36]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'AIMANTS DE PIÈCE POLAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/43]
Former [2014/43]MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR FIELD POLE MAGNET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014Translation filed 
11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Search fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
13.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2017Fee for grant paid
26.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2017
Opposition(s)14.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.11.2012
AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2018/52]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/41]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
LU19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/33]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[IA]JP2011244613  (NISSAN MOTOR) [I] 1,4 * paragraph [0036]; figure 6 * [A] 2,3,5;
 [IA]JP2004328927  (NEOMAX CO LTD) [I] 1,4 * paragraph [0037]; figure 7 * [A] 2,3,5;
 [A]EP2333935  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0054] , [0055]; figure 7 *
International search[Y]JP2010252514  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2004328927  (NEOMAX CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010154749  (SUMIDA CORP.);
 [A]JP2006238565  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2009033958