blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2791981

EP2791981 - SELF-ERECTING PORTABLE PHOTOVOLTAIC PANEL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Raytheon Company
870 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COX, Donald P.
1372 West Valley Ridge Place
Oro Valley, Arizona 85737 / US
02 / MCMONAGLE, Donald R.
7737 East Shadow Vista Court
Tucson, Arizona 85750 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date12858423.215.10.2012
WO2012US60274
Priority number, dateUS20111332755015.12.2011         Original published format: US201113327550
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013089909
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791981
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:H01L31/05, H02S20/00, H02S30/20
[2015/23]
CPC:
H02S20/00 (EP,US); F24S25/10 (EP,US); F24S25/13 (EP,US);
H01L31/03926 (EP,US); H02S10/40 (EP,US); H02S30/20 (EP,US);
E04H15/08 (EP,US); E04H15/58 (EP,US); E04H2015/201 (EP,US);
Y02E10/47 (EP,US); Y02E10/50 (EP,US); Y10T29/49355 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/43]H01L31/045, H01L31/05
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:SELBSTERRICHTENDES TRAGBARES PV-MODULSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2014/43]
English:SELF-ERECTING PORTABLE PHOTOVOLTAIC PANEL SYSTEM AND METHOD[2014/43]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PANNEAU PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE PORTATIF AUTODÉPLIABLE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Search fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
08.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/22]
13.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010065104  (BARUH BRADFORD G [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0138] - [0141] - [ 100]; figures 27, 28 * [I] 4,7,10,12,15;
 [XI]US2006033674  (ESSIG JOHN R JR [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0224] , [ 233] , [ 213] , [ 196] , [ 197] , [ 435]; figures 1A, 2D, 4A, 4K * [I] 2,7,9,12,14,15;
 [XI]US2010018566  (JACKSON ORIN [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 38] , [0 41] - [0049]; figures 1, 3B * [I] 4,5,10,12;
 [A]DE102006019753  (ROPPELT HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] - [0 38] , [00 4]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]DE102010010169  (SOLARDYNAMIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0061]; figures 14a, 14b *;
 [A]WO0019042  (NAGLE IAN GERARD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2011214667  (BARUH BRADFORD G [US]);
 [Y]US2009090741  (OBERHOFER KURT [DE], et al);
 [Y]US4577051  (HARTMAN ROBERT A [US]);
 [Y]US2009189574  (LE THANH [US], et al);
 [YP]US2012073466  (WANG HUDSON [CN])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.