EP2791645 - MULTIPHASE SAMPLE CONTAINER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Typhonix AS P.O. Box 6 4349 Bryne / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Typhonix AS 6 4349 Bryne / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSVEG, Trygve Odlandsveien 10 N-4360 Varhaug / NO | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Protector IP AS Pilestredet 33 0166 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Hov, Espen, et al Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 12858478.6 | 14.12.2012 | WO2012NO50249 | Priority number, date | NO20110001734 | 16.12.2011 Original published format: NO 20111734 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013089564 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791645 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 20.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/20, G01N33/28 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/1833 (EP,NO,US);
G01N1/10 (NO,US);
G01N33/2823 (EP,NO,US);
G01N2001/2071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | MEHRPHASIGER PROBENBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/43] | English: | MULTIPHASE SAMPLE CONTAINER AND METHOD | [2014/43] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR ÉCHANTILLON MULTIPHASIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XN | 15.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2998096 (SNIPES ROLLIE J) [Y] 2,4,5 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 15 ** figure 1 *; | [YD]US6182505 (SEGERAL GERARD [FR]) [YD] 1-7 * column 1, lines 8-19 * * column 4, line 35 - column 8, line 13 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2011259430 (FRIEDEMANN JOHN DANIEL [NO]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0017] - [0021] * * figure 1 * | International search | [AD]US4844817 (FLANIGAN DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US4905510 (BRICKHOUSE PAUL E [US]); | [A]NO178807B (DYBDAHL BJOERN [NO]); | [XD]US6182505 (SEGERAL GERARD [FR]); | [A]US2004112150 (GERMOND BAPTISTE [FR]) |