Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791857

EP2791857 - FACILITATING SYSTEM SERVICE REQUEST INTERACTIONS FOR HARDWARE-PROTECTED APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/22]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAUMANN, Andrew A.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / HUNT, Galen C.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / PEINADO, Marcus
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2014/43]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
IP
Rosental 4
80331 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date12858489.304.12.2012
[2019/32]
WO2012US67660
Priority number, dateUS20111332356212.12.2011         Original published format: US201113323562
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090044
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791857
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2791857
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/60, G06F15/16, G06F9/44
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERAKTIONEN ZWISCHEN SYSTEMDIENSTANFORDERUNGEN FÜR HARDWAREGESCHÜTZTE ANWENDUNGEN[2014/43]
English:FACILITATING SYSTEM SERVICE REQUEST INTERACTIONS FOR HARDWARE-PROTECTED APPLICATIONS[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FACILITATION D'INTERACTIONS DE DEMANDES DE SERVICES DE SYSTÈME POUR DES APPLICATIONS À PROTECTION MATÉRIELLE[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2014National basic fee paid 
05.06.2014Search fee paid 
05.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
27.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2019Fee for grant paid
25.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1526425  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0054] * [I] 3,5-7,9,10;
 [A]US2005240985  (ALKOVE JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] *
 [XI]  - GARFINKEL T ET AL, "Ostia: A Delegating Architecture for Secure System Call Interposition", INTERNET CITATION, (20031204), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20031204014221/www.stanford.edu/ talg/papers/NDSS04/ostia-ndss04.pdf, (20060419), XP002377439 [X] 1,4,8 * page 1, column 2, line 2 - line 6 * * page 1, column 2, line 25 - line 29 * * page 2, column 2, line 48 - line 51 * * 3.2 Delegating architectures;; figure 2 * * Emulation library; page 4, column 2 * [I] 2,3,5-7,9,10
International search[A]US2005033980  (WILLMAN BRYAN MARK [US], et al);
 [A]US2005060722  (ROCHETTE DONN [US], et al);
 [A]US2007174910  (ZACHMAN FREDERICK J [US], et al);
 [A]US2011202739  (GRISENTHWAITE RICHARD ROY [GB]);
 [A]US2010306848  (GELLERICH WOLFGANG [DE])
by applicantEP1526425
    - GARFINKEL T et al., "Ostia: A Delegating Architecture for Secure System Call Interposition", INTERNET CITATION, (20031204), URL: http:/ /web.archive.org/web/20031204014221 /www .stanford.edu/ talg/papers/ N DSS04/ostia-ndss04.pdf