Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793136

EP2793136 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND CONTENT DOWNLOAD METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2016/24]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Hirotsugu
c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / CHATANI, Masayuki
c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12858599.905.12.2012
WO2012JP07796
Priority number, dateJP2011027510815.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275108
JP2011027510915.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275109
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088676
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793136
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/458, H04N21/25, H04N21/436, H04N21/443
[2016/10]
Former International [2015/45]H04N21/258, H04N21/458, H04N21/25, H04N21/2543, H04N21/6334, H04N21/658
Former International [2014/43]G06F13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERUNTERLADEN VON INHALTEN[2014/43]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND CONTENT DOWNLOAD METHOD[2014/43]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TÉLÉCHARGEMENT DE CONTENU[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2014Translation filed 
27.05.2014National basic fee paid 
27.05.2014Search fee paid 
27.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
03.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2061228  (ECHOSTAR TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * [0006], [0007], [0009], [0019], [0035], [0036], [0038], [0041], [0057], [0059] * * figures 1-2 * [I] 4,5;
 [XI]US2006085826  (FUNK JAMES M [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6-8 * [0010], [0011], [0045], [0046], [0048], [0049] * * figures 3,4 * [I] 2-5;
 [XYI]US2006041923  (MCQUAIDE ARNOLD JR [US]) [X] 9 * [0006]-[0013], [0024], [0026]-[0028], [0030], [0031], [0033], [0037] * * figures 1-2 * [Y] 11,13,14 [I] 10,12;
 [XI]US2010333135  (LAU ERWIN [HK] ET AL) [X] 9 * [0003], [0004], [0007], [0033], [0034], [0054], [0059] * * figure 4 * [I] 10,12;
 [Y]US2007064157  (KASAMATSU HIDEKI [JP]) [Y] 11 * [0001], [0004]-[0006], [0010], [0024]-[0027], [0031] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2009190582  (NAMBIATH RAGHU [US] ET AL) [Y] 13,14 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2010061395  (SONY CORP.);
 [Y]JP2011130363  (KABUSHIKI KAISHA RTV);
 [Y]JP2007511821  (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC.);
 [X]JP2008159193  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JP2011137885  (CANON INC.);
 [A]JP2006115299  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS JAPAN, INC.)
by applicantUS7076467
 US6560612