Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792868

EP2792868 - EXHAUST TURBINE SUPERCHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIRAISHI, Keiichi
C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/32]
Former [2014/43]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12858657.512.12.2012
[2017/32]
WO2012JP82259
Priority number, dateJP2011027598016.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011275980
[2014/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089159
Date:20.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792868
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792868
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F02B37/007, F02B29/04, F02M35/12, F01D25/30, F02C6/12, F02C7/045
[2016/27]
Former International [2015/42]F02B37/007, F02M35/12, F01D25/30, F02C6/12, F02C7/045
Former International [2014/43]F02B39/00, F02B37/00, F02M35/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABGASTURBINENSUPERLADER[2014/43]
English:EXHAUST TURBINE SUPERCHARGER[2014/43]
French:COMPRESSEUR DE SURALIMENTATION POUR TURBINE D'ÉCHAPPEMENT[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2014Translation filed 
11.06.2014National basic fee paid 
11.06.2014Search fee paid 
11.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
14.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2017Fee for grant paid
26.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2012
AT09.08.2017
CY09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
MK09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU12.12.2012
AT09.08.2017
CY09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2019/31]HU12.12.2012
AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2019/30]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
GB12.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE12.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
LU12.12.2017
MT12.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011239648  (SHIRAISHI KEIICHI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1510667  (ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024]; figures 1,2 *
International search[A]JPS60114245U  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JPS51120315  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [A]JP2010127239  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al);
 [A]JP2001295623  (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO)
ExaminationUS2006080958
by applicantJP2011043139