Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2792868 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2792868



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 281
13.06.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.08.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.06.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
01.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
14.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
14.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
14.11.2016 Description Search / examination 25
14.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.03.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.03.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 25
14.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
14.03.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
08.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
24.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
21.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
02.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
11.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
11.06.2014 Claims filed under Art.19 PCT Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 Description Search / examination 25
11.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
11.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
20.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 23