Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795373

EP2795373 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING TANDEM GRAVIMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2017  [2017/33]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
Prad Research And Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
Prad Research And Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
Inventor(s)01 / LULING, Martin G.
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger
1 rue Henri Becquerel
BP 202
F-92142 Clamart CEDEX / FR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Rzaniak, Martin
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger
Intellectual Property Law Department
1, rue Henri Becquerel, BP 202
92142 Clamart / FR
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12858841.519.12.2012
WO2012US70514
Priority number, dateUS201161578849P21.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578849 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013096391
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2795373
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01V5/12
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN MIT TANDEMGRAVIMETER[2014/44]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING TANDEM GRAVIMETER[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT UN GRAVIMÈTRE TANDEM[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
09.09.2014Search fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/44]
26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/33]
06.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/33]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
09.09.2014Request for further processing filed
09.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.09.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009235732  (DIFOGGIO ROCCO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0018] , [0026] - [0029] - [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2010161226  (HOMAN DEAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0026] - [0028]; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]EP1760495  (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0019]; figures 2A, 2B *
 [A]  - J. COTTAM ET AL, "Gravitationally redshifted absorption lines in the X-ray burst spectra of a neutron star", NATURE, (20021107), vol. 420, no. 6911, doi:10.1038/nature01159, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 51 - 54, XP055214314 [A] 1,13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01159
International search[A]US3202822  (PAUL KEHLER);
 [A]US2010161226  (HOMAN DEAN [US]);
 [A]US5448912  (BLACK ANDREW J [US]);
 [A]US2009235732  (DIFOGGIO ROCCO [US]);
 [A]US2011191027  (PFUTZNER HAROLD [US], et al)