Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795804

EP2795804 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING MESSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Jin Yong
No.1-719 Hanshin Jamsil Core Apt.
Sincheon-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-240 / KR
02 / CHOI, Yong Ho
No.3-901 Daelim Apt.
Sadang 3-dong
Dongjak-gu
Seoul 156-093 / KR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Gover, Richard Paul
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date12858927.205.12.2012
WO2012KR10450
Priority number, dateKR2011013716519.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110137165
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013094896
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795804
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/40, H04W4/12
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG VON NACHRICHTEN[2014/44]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING MESSAGE[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION D'UN MESSAGE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Search fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
04.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/26]
18.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/26]
10.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005160372  (GRUEN DANIEL M [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0059]; figures 3,4 *;
 [I]US2008263157  (BHOGAL KULVIR SINGH [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0047] *;
 [I]US2005144571  (LOVERIN DARRELL J [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 34] - [0038] *;
 [A]US2011252362  (CHO SEONHWI [KR] ET AL) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0111] - [0115] *;
 [A]US2008168386  (BRINDA DAVID R [US] ET AL) [A] 7 * paragraph [0032] *
International search[X]KR20090005741  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]KR20100104299  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]KR20080045948  (LG-NORTEL CO., LTD.)
by applicantUS2011252362