Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794057

EP2794057 - METHOD FOR REMOVING CHLORAMINE WITH A FILTRATION MEDIUM COMPRISING A METAL-CONTAINING PARTICULATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]FILTRATION MEDIUM COMPRISING A METAL-CONTAINING PARTICULATE
[2017/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2018/40]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STOUFFER, Mark R.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / DOYLE, Meredith M.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / SIEDLE, Allen R.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / WOOD, Thomas E.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/40]
Former [2014/44]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12859147.613.12.2012
[2018/40]
WO2012US69414
Priority number, dateUS201161578967P22.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578967 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096079
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794057
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794057
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D39/14, C02F1/58, C02F1/28, B01D15/00, B01D35/00, B01J20/02
[2015/29]
Former International [2014/44]B01D39/14, C02F1/58, C02F1/28, B01D15/00, B01D35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CHLORAMINENTFERNUNG MIT EINEM FILTERMEDIUM MIT METALLHALTIGEN PARTIKELN[2017/44]
English:METHOD FOR REMOVING CHLORAMINE WITH A FILTRATION MEDIUM COMPRISING A METAL-CONTAINING PARTICULATE[2017/44]
French:MÉTHODE D'ÉLIMINATION DE CHLORAMINE UTILISANT UN MILIEU DE FILTRATION COMPRENANT DES PARTICULES À TENEUR EN MÉTAL[2017/44]
Former [2014/44]FILTERMEDIUM MIT METALLHALTIGEN PARTIKELN
Former [2014/44]FILTRATION MEDIUM COMPRISING A METAL-CONTAINING PARTICULATE
Former [2014/44]MILIEU DE FILTRATION COMPRENANT DES PARTICULES À TENEUR EN MÉTAL
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
02.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2018Fee for grant paid
27.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2017
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
LU13.12.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
LU13.12.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
IT03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN101804324  (UNIV NANJING) [X] 1-6,11-13 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * [I] 7,8,14;
 [X]EP0679435  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1,6,11 * claims 7, 8 *;
 [X]US2005006306  (NOLAND SCOTT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6 * claim 11 *
International search[X]US2005011827  (KOSLOW, EVAN E.);
 [Y]US6699393  (BAKER, FREDERICK STANLEY ET AL.);
 [Y]US7361280  (BAKER, FREDERICK STANLEY);
 [A]US4624937  (CHOU, SHINE K.);
 [A]US6342129  (VAUGHN, ROBERT H. ET AL.)
by applicantUS5338458
 US6699393
 US2009039028
    - VIKESLAND et al., Environmental Science and Technologies, vol. 200, no. 34, pages 83 - 90