Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793565

EP2793565 - IMPROVEMENTS TO APICULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flowbee Australia Pty Ltd
356 Old Byron Bay Road
Newrybar, NSW 2479 / AU
[2019/14]
Former [2018/49]For all designated states
Flowbee Australia Pty Ltd
509 Wallace Road
The Channon, NSW 2480 / AU
Former [2016/17]For all designated states
Flowbee Australia Pty Ltd
509 Wallace Road
The Channon, NSW 2480 / AU
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Anderson, Cedar
Lot 12 Seven Mile Beach Road
Broken Head NSW 2481 / AU
For all designated states
Anderson, Stuart
509 Wallace Road
The Channon NSW 2480 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Cedar
Lot 12 Seven Mile Beach Road
Broken Head, NSW 2481 / AU
02 / ANDERSON, Stuart
509 Wallace Road
The Channon, NSW 2480 / AU
 [2016/17]
Former [2014/44]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Bradley, Adrian
Cleveland LLP
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[2018/49]
Former [2014/44]Whitaker, Iain Mark
Alban Patent Agency The Old Pump House
1a Stonecross
St. Albans
Hertfordshire AL1 4AA / GB
Application number, filing date12859200.321.12.2012
[2018/49]
WO2012AU01589
Priority number, dateAU2011090534921.12.2011         Original published format: AU 2011905349
AU2012090036802.02.2012         Original published format: AU 2012900368
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091018
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793565
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793565
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01K47/04, A01K47/00, A01K59/00, A01K59/02, A01K47/02
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/44]A01K47/04, A01K47/00, A01K59/00, A01K59/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN EINER BIENENZUCHT[2014/44]
English:IMPROVEMENTS TO APICULTURE[2014/44]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À L'APICULTURE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2018Fee for grant paid
12.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2018
Opposition(s)06.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
DK05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
MC05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
DK05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
MC05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/45]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
MC05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XAI]GB592090  (JOSE ROVIRA CASES) [X] 1 * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 44; figure -; claim 1 * [A] 3,6,10,11 [I] 2,4,5,7,8;
 [A]FR2572623  (DOUARRE GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 28 - page 3, line 25; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4280236  (HERMAN LUTHER R) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 38; figure - *
International search[A]FR2572623  (DOUARRE GEORGES [FR]);
 [A]GB460616  (ALEJANDRO PANEI);
 [A]EP0921721  (BENCSIK JOSEPH [FR])