Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794425

EP2794425 - MULTILAYER FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plantic Technologies LTD
51 Burns Road
Altona, VIC 3018 / AU
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / McCAFFREY, Nicholas John
8 La Frank Street
Burwood, Victoria 3125 / AU
02 / KHALIL, Roya
9 Goodjohn Court
Endeavour Hills, Victoria 3802 / AU
03 / OAKLEY, Nicholas Roy
120 McIntyre Road
Lara, Victoria 3212 / AU
04 / MORRIS, Brendan
10 Girton Crescent
Manifold Heights, Victoria 3218 / AU
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12859340.723.05.2012
WO2012AU00577
Priority number, dateAU2011090538322.12.2011         Original published format: AU 2011905383
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013090973
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794425
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/18, B65D81/24, B32B27/06, C08L3/08, C09D103/08
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/44]B65D81/18, B65D81/24, B32B27/06, C08L3/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE FOLIEN[2014/44]
English:MULTILAYER FILMS[2014/44]
French:FILMS MULTI-COUCHES[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
03.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1802698  (PLANTIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; [0023]-[0034] and [0045]-[0047]; claims 1-11; figures 1-4; examples * [Y] 8;
 [Y]WO2007140538  (PLANTIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 4, line 12 - page 8, line 17; page 8, line 21 - page 10, line 28; page 12, line 26 - page 20, line 6; claims 1-20; examples *;
 [Y]EP0539604  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 3, line 15 - page 6, line 7; page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 5; claims 1-8; examples *;
 [Y]US2007042207  (BERGER WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; [0050]-[0112]; claims 1-47; examples *;
 [Y]WO2006037157  (PLANTIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2008014573  (PLANTIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6242102  (TOMKA IVAN [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2009312462  (OAKLEY NICHOLAS ROY [AU], et al);
 [Y]US2011033700  (CAYLUS JEAN-YVES [FR]);
 [A]US4393106  (MARUHASHI YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al)