Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793752

EP2793752 - ANCHORING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REPLACING OR REPAIRING A HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / CONKLIN, Brian S.
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12859718.415.11.2012
WO2012US65312
Priority number, dateUS201161578758P21.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578758 P
US20121367580113.11.2012         Original published format: US201213675801
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095816
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793752
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/44]A61F2/24, A61M39/22, A61L27/14, A61L27/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERANKERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERSETZEN ODER REPARIEREN EINER HERZKLAPPE[2014/44]
English:ANCHORING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REPLACING OR REPAIRING A HEART VALVE[2014/44]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR REMPLACER OU RÉPARER UNE VALVE CARDIAQUE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Search fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
07.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2010145440  (KERAENEN OLLI [SE]) [X] 1-4,10-15 * paragraphs [0889] - [0091] - [ 100] , [ 101] , [ 107] , [ 117] - [0118] - [ 122] , [ 129§]; figures 4, 7, 14a, 14b * [A] 6-9 [I] 5;
 [X]US2011224785  (HACOHEN GIL [IL]) [X] 1,4,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0095] , [0 97]; figure 5B *;
 [XP]WO2012095116  (FIGULLA HANS REINER [DE]; LAUTEN ALEXANDER [DE]) [XP] 1-4,6,7,9,11,13,14 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, lines 4-14 * * page 3, lines 6-18 * * page 4, lines 24-30 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 34 *;
 [XP]WO2012094406  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]; NAVIA JOSE L [US]) [XP] 1-4,6-12,15 * figures 1-18 * * page 10, paragraph last - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 3 * * page 32, paragraph 2 *;
 [XP]WO2012087842  (FOUNDRY LLC [US]; GIFFORD III HANSON S [US]; FANN JAMES I [US]; MORRIS) [XP] 1-4,6-8,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0012] - [0034]; figures 224, 38, 41, 43-45 *;
 [E]WO2013175468  (TEL HASHOMER MEDICAL RES INFRA [IL]) [E] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * page 13, lines 24-31; figures 1-4, 31a, 31i *
International search[Y]US2010204785  (ALKHATIB, Y. F.);
 [Y]US7377941  (RHEE, R. S. ET AL.);
 [A]US2005203617  (FORSTER, D. C. ET AL.);
 [A]US2004127982  (MACHOLD, T. R. ET AL.);
 [A]US2009043381  (MACOVIAK, J. A. ET AL.)
by applicantUS5411552
 US20100821628