Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796522

EP2796522 - ADHESIVE TAPE PREVENTING ADHESION BY AQUATIC ORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nitto Denko Corporation
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / KURATA, Naoki
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-1-2 Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
02 / NAITO, Tomonari
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-1-2 Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
03 / SUEYOSHI, Taiki
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-1-2 Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
04 / SUZUKI, Satoru
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-1-2 Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
05 / HARA, Kazutaka
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-1-2 Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/25]
Former [2014/44]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date12859789.505.12.2012
[2019/25]
WO2012JP81528
Priority number, dateJP2011027933321.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011279333
JP2011027933421.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011279334
JP2012006206819.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012062068
JP2012007563229.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012075632
[2014/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013094411
Date:27.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796522
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796522
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/29, B32B27/00, C09D183/04, C09D5/16, B08B17/02, B63B59/04
[2019/02]
Former International [2015/31]C09J7/02, B32B27/00, C09D183/00, C09D5/16, B08B17/02, B63B59/04, C08K5/00, C08K5/01, C08K5/54
Former International [2014/44]C09J7/02, B32B27/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEBEBAND ZUR ANHAFTUNGSVERHINDERUNG VON WASSERORGANISMEN[2019/02]
English:ADHESIVE TAPE PREVENTING ADHESION BY AQUATIC ORGANISMS[2014/44]
French:RUBAN ADHÉSIF EMPÊCHANT L'ADHÉRENCE D'ORGANISMES AQUATIQUES[2014/44]
Former [2014/44]ANHAFTUNGSVERHINDERUNG FÜR EIN KLEBEBAND MITTELS WASSERORGANISMEN
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014Translation filed 
03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
11.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.05.2019Fee for grant paid
09.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JP2001131413  (KURUME RES PARK KK, et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0054] * * claims 1, 3, 6, 7 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 6-14;
 [Y]JP3276583B  (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US6925952  (POPOVIC DAVID J [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 4, line 5 - line 8 * * claims 1-17 *;
 [XPAI]WO2012064081  (SON SANG DAL [KR]) [XP] 1,5 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0068] * * figure 3 * [A] 2-4 [I] 6-14
International search[X]JPH0633024  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD);
 [X]JP2002069246  (DAIKIN IND LTD);
 [Y]JPS6186445U  (NITTO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPS5813673  (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS);
 [Y]JPS5196830  (THE INTERNATIONAL PAINT CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2006109600  (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS [JP], et al)
by applicantJPS6362487B
 JPH0154397B
 JP3000101B
 JP2002069246