Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795789

EP2795789 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOW SPEED CONTROL OF POLYPHASE AC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.07.2017  [2017/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZBB Energy Corporation
N93 W14475 Whittaker Way
Menomonee Falls, WI 53051 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / REICHARD, Jeffrey, A.
W353 N6318 Marina Drive
Oconomowoc, WI 53066 / US
02 / JOBE, Nathan
N108 W16234 Hawthorne Drive
Germantown, WI 553022 / US
03 / LAUBENSTEIN, Thomas, Alan
W264 S7485 Mount Whitney Avenue
Waukesha, WI 53189 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date12859814.119.12.2012
WO2012US70694
Priority number, dateUS201161577477P19.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161577477 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096492
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795789
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02P9/08, H02J3/38, H02P23/03, H02M5/453, H02M7/219
[2016/28]
Former International [2014/44]H02P9/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER MEHRPHASIGEN WECHSELSTROMMASCHINE BEI NIEDRIGER GESCHWINDIGKEIT[2014/44]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOW SPEED CONTROL OF POLYPHASE AC MACHINE[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT UNE COMMANDE DE VITESSE LENTE D'UNE MACHINE À COURANT ALTERNATIF POLYPHASÉ[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2014National basic fee paid 
15.07.2014Search fee paid 
15.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
25.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/29]
17.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]GB2432267  (CONVERTEAM LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 19, line 11 - page 20, line 29; figures 1,4 * * page 21, line 4 - line 8 * * page 43, line 19 - line 31 * * page 24, line 19 - line 23 * * page 11, line 20 - line 24 * * page 26, line 6 - line 18 * * page 27, line 1 - page 35, line 26 * [Y] 4,8-11 [I] 2,3,5-7;
 [Y]EP2053734  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,8-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-3,4A,4B,8-10 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0010] *;
 [A]US2010327585  (CAO SHU YU [SG], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0103]; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [XYI]JPH069400U  (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [X] 1 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,8-11 [I] 2,3,5-7;
 [XYI]JP2003299396  (EBARA DENSAN LTD) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1,4; examples 1,2 * * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 4,8-11 [I] 2,5-7
International search[Y]JPH069400U  (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2003299396  (EBARA DENSAN LTD);
 [A]WO2004047284  (ZEPHYR CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2008005663  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]US2010171381  (LING GANGQIN [CN])