Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793760

EP2793760 - EXPANDABLE INTERBODY IMPLANT AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc.
2500 Silveus Crossing
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / PALMATIER, Stanley T.
4793 Hilldale Drive
Olive Branch, Mississippi 38654 / US
02 / MILLER, Keith E.
7348 Bellville Drive
Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US
03 / MELKENT, Anthony J.
225 Lombardy
Memphis, Tennessee38117 / US
04 / ARMSTRONG, William D.
1856 Autumn Avenue
Memphis, Tennessee 38112 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2018/32]
Former [2014/44]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date12860063.202.11.2012
[2018/32]
WO2012US63259
Priority number, dateUS20111332984519.12.2011         Original published format: US201113329845
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095789
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793760
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793760
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44, A61B17/70, A61F2/28, A61F2/30
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/44]A61F2/44, A61B17/70, A61F2/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXPANDIERBARES ZWISCHENWIRBELIMPLANTAT UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN[2014/44]
English:EXPANDABLE INTERBODY IMPLANT AND METHODS OF USE[2014/44]
French:IMPLANT INTERVERTÉBRAL EXPANSIBLE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Search fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
14.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2018Fee for grant paid
28.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18182174.5  / EP3403621
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2018
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
LU02.11.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
LU02.11.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/34]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
LU02.11.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/33]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT08.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2010292796  (GREENHALGH E SKOTT [US] ET AL) [Y] 1,4-10 * paragraphs [0049] - [0057]; figures 1a,1b,3a,3b * [A] 2,3,11-15;
 [YA]US6685742  (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [Y] 1,4-10 * column 4, lines 4-21; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3,11-15;
 [A]US2006030943  (PETERMAN MARC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031]; figures 1,7,8 *;
 [A]WO2011007240  (MEDTECH RES SA [CH]; PERISIC MICHAEL [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 14 - line 23; figures §-7 *;
 [A]US2002128713  (FERREE BRET [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062]; figures 11a-12b *
International search[A]US2011301711  (PALMATIER, S. ET AL.);
 [A]US2010217397  (POINTILLART, V. ET AL.);
 [A]US2011172774  (VARELA, A.);
 [A]KR20050064501  (TAEYEONMEDICAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]US2009228109  (POINTILLANT, V. ET AL.)
by applicantUS2010292796
 US6685742