Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794848

EP2794848 - REACTIVE OXYGEN SPECIES-RESISTANT MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joule Unlimited Technologies, Inc.
18 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / CONNOR, Michael
c/o Joule Unlimited Technologies Inc.
18 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
02 / SKRALY, Frank, A.
c/o Joule Unlimited Technologies Inc.
18 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Campbell, Patrick John Henry
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12860175.421.12.2012
WO2012US71250
Priority number, dateUS201161580094P23.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161580094 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096770
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794848
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N15/31, C12N15/52, C12P7/06, C07H21/04
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:GEGEN REAKTIVE SAUERSTOFFSPEZIES BESTÄNDIGE MIKROORGANISMEN[2014/44]
English:REACTIVE OXYGEN SPECIES-RESISTANT MICROORGANISMS[2014/44]
French:MICRO-ORGANISMES RÉSISTANTS AUX ESPÈCES RÉACTIVES DE L'OXYGÈNE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Search fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
15.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/48]
25.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2016
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011124073  (DEVROE ERIC JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 23] , [0 80] , [ 296] , [ 302] * [Y] 7,9 [I] 11,12;
 [XY]  - KAKU NOBUO ET AL, "Effects of overexpression of Escherichia coli katE and bet genes on the tolerance for salt stress in a freshwater cyanobacterium Synechococcus sp. PCC 7942", PLANT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, (20001101), vol. 159, no. 2, ISSN 0168-9452, pages 281 - 288, XP002698207 [X] 2,6,8,14 * the whole document * * in particular page 283, paragraph 3.1.; Fig. 4; pages 285-286, paragraph 3.5. * [Y] 7,9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9452(00)00353-8
 [X]  - DENG M-D ET AL, "Ethanol synthesis by genetic engineering in cyanobacteria", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19990201), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 523 - 528, XP003016237 [X] 1,3-5,13,14 * the whole document * * in particular abstract *
 [A]  - GÜNTHER REGELSBERGER ET AL, "Occurrence and biochemistry of hydroperoxidases in oxygenic phototrophic prokaryotes (cyanobacteria)", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (20020601), vol. 40, no. 6-8, doi:10.1016/S0981-9428(02)01405-5, ISSN 0981-9428, pages 479 - 490, XP055199366 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular page 480, col. 2, paragraph 2.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0981-9428(02)01405-5
International search[X]US2011262975  (BERRY DAVID A [US], et al);
 [X]US2011124073  (DEVROE ERIC JAMES [US], et al);
 [Y]  - REGELSBERGER, G ET AL., "Purification And Characterization Of A Hydroperoxidase From The Cyanobacterium Synechocystis PCC 6803: Identification Of Its Gene By Peptide Mass Mapping Using Matrix Assisted Laser Desorption Ionization Time-Of-Light Mass Spectrometry.", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS., (1999), vol. 170, pages 1 - 12, XP055162849

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.1999.tb13348.x
 [Y]  - OSSOWSKI, IV ET AL., "Nucleotide Sequence Of Escherichia Coli KatE, Which Encodes Catalase HPII.", J. BACTERIOL., (199101), vol. 173, no. 2, pages 514 - 520, XP001068657
 [Y]  - CHANG, IS ET AL., "Use Of Sulfite And Hydrogen Peroxide To Control Bacterial Contamination", ETHANOL FERMENTATION. APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (199701), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 1 - 6, XP055157124
 [L]  - "integrated into UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot. 01-FEB-1997", P73911 (KATG_SYNY3), (20080722), URL: http://www.uniprot.org/uniproUP73911.txt?version=76, (20130509), XP055163346