Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801679

EP2801679 - FLOORING SYSTEM AND CONNECTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/46]LOCKING TYPE PANEL AND PANEL CONNECTING PIECE AND CONNECTION METHOD THEREFOR
[2018/46]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zhang, Jia Ming
No.30 Lane 6 Gaoyang South Road
Gao Ping Village
Longtan Township, Taoyuan County / TW
For all designated states
Xu, Bei Jia
No.30 Lane 6 Gaoyang South Road
Gao Ping Village
Longtan Township, Taoyuan County / TW
For all designated states
Zhang, Qi Hui
No.30 Lane 6 Gaoyang South Road
Gao Ping Village
Longtan Township, Taoyuan County / TW
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Svingor, Adam
Danubia
Patent & Law Office LLC
Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16
1051 Budapest / HU
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date12860227.319.12.2012
[2019/19]
WO2012CN01714
Priority number, dateCN20111043111121.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110431111
[2014/46]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013091284
Date:27.06.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801679
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801679
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BODENBELAGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG[2018/46]
English:FLOORING SYSTEM AND CONNECTION METHOD THEREFOR[2018/46]
French:SYSTEME DE REVETEMENT DE SOL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CELUI-CI[2018/46]
Former [2014/46]VERRIEGELUNGSPLATTE UND PLATTENVERBINDUNGSSTÜCK SOWIE VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Former [2014/46]LOCKING TYPE PANEL AND PANEL CONNECTING PIECE AND CONNECTION METHOD THEREFOR
Former [2014/46]PANNEAU DU TYPE À ENCLENCHEMENT ET PIÈCE DE RACCORDEMENT DE PANNEAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CELUI-CI
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014Translation filed 
02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Search fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
30.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2019Fee for grant paid
28.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[A]CN201924551U  (ZHANG, JIAMING ET AL.) [A] 1-57 * figures 1,3,6 *
International search[XP]CN102493625  (ZHANG, JIAMING ET AL.);
 [A]CN201924552U  (ZHANG, JIAMING ET AL.);
 [A]CN201924551U  (ZHANG, JIAMING ET AL.);
 [A]CN2595922Y  (YIHUA WOOD INDUSTRY CO LTD GUA);
 [A]JP2006316533  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD)
ExaminationEP1188879
by applicantUS6874292
 US6460306
 US7614791
 US6769217
 CN19971090692