Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2801679 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2801679



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 678
20.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
28.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
28.03.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 10
28.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.12.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.12.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.12.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.12.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 88
06.12.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 88
09.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 21
09.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Annex to a communication Search / examination 21
25.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 20
14.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 19
14.09.2018 Description Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.07.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.03.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.03.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
30.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
30.05.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.12.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
12.11.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
29.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 Drawings Search / examination 32
04.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Deficiencies in translation of international application Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
02.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 9
02.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
02.07.2014 Description Search / examination 33
02.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 32
27.06.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 97