Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2801679


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
05.04.2019 (Expected) grant published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
01.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.03.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.12.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.10.2018 Change - German title published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
12.10.2018 Change - English title published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
12.10.2018 Change - French title published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
17.09.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.07.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.03.2018 First examination report
27.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
09.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2015 Change - classification published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
13.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
20.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication